WA HB1945 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-01 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-01 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing prospective jurors who are elderly to choose to be excused from jury service or to remain a prospective juror.
Title
Allowing prospective jurors who are elderly to choose to be excused from jury service or to remain a prospective juror.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-03 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1945&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1945.pdf |