WA HB1923 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Effective date 7/28/2019*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing urban residential building capacity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increasing urban residential building capacity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 75 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 33 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09HouseEffective date 7/28/2019*.
2019-05-09HouseChapter 348, 2019 Laws.
2019-05-09HouseGovernor signed.
2019-04-27HouseDelivered to Governor.
2019-04-26SenatePresident signed.
2019-04-25HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-04-24HousePassed final passage; yeas, 75; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 4.
2019-04-24HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2019-04-22SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 33; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2019-04-22SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-22SenateFloor amendment
2019-04-22SenateReturned to second reading for amendment.
2019-04-22SenateSenate receded from amendments.
2019-04-18HouseHouse refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments.
2019-04-13SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 33; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 4.
2019-04-13SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-04-13SenateFloor amendment
2019-04-13SenateCommittee amendment not adopted.
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2019-04-09SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2019-04-09SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2019-04-09SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-09SenateWM - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-09SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2019-04-05SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2019-04-02SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2019-04-01SenateMinority; do not pass.
2019-04-01SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2019-04-01SenateHSA - Majority; do pass with amendment
2019-04-01SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-27SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-18SenateFirst reading, referred to Housing Stability & Affordability.
2019-03-13HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 66; nays, 30; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2019-03-13HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-13HouseFloor amendment
2019-03-13House2nd substitute bill substituted
2019-03-08HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-03-01HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-02-28HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2019-02-28HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-28HouseAPP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-28HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM.
2019-02-26HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-22HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2019-02-21HouseMinority; do not pass.
2019-02-21HouseENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2019-02-21HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM.
2019-02-19HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM.
2019-02-14HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM.
2019-02-06HouseFirst reading, referred to Environment & Energy.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1923&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1923.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1923-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1923-S2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1923-S2.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1923-S2.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/House/1923-S2.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=119191&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-13-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1923&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=119191&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-13-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1923&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=119191&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-22-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1923&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=119191&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-24-2019&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1923&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback