WA HB1918 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning community preservation and development authorities.
Title
Concerning community preservation and development authorities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | House | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-05-21 | House | Chapter 447, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-21 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-26 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2019-04-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2019-03-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-03-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-01 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-20 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-20 | House | HOUS - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-06 | House | First reading, referred to Housing, Community Development & Veterans. |