WA HB1918 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing treatment of groundwater under state water codes to support rural development while protecting instream flows.
Title
Addressing treatment of groundwater under state water codes to support rural development while protecting instream flows.
Sponsors
Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Rep. Kristine Lytton [D] | Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] |
Rep. Eric Pettigrew [D] | Sen. June Robinson [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2017-02-16 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-16 | House | AGNR - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-16 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-07 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. |
2017-02-02 | House | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1918&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1918.pdf |