WA HB1914 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-8)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-8)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Updating and expanding the motion picture competitiveness program.
Title
Updating and expanding the motion picture competitiveness program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Committee on Finance: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Community & Economic Development (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - House - House Committee on Community & Economic Development: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House Committee on Finance: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Community & Economic Development (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-28 - House - House Committee on Community & Economic Development: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-31 | House | Chapter 270, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-31 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-10 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 96; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-03-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 3; absent, 1; excused, 0. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:00 PM. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 5:00 PM. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2022-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-04 | House | Floor amendment |
2022-03-04 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-03-03 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-17 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-17 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Community & Economic Development. |
2022-02-17 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2022-01-28 | House | CED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Community & Economic Development. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5760 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-10 - Returned to Rules.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 365 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 365 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 365 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 365 | 040 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 365 | 050 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 04 | 4489 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |