WA SB5760 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-10 - Returned to Rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-10 - Returned to Rules.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Updating and expanding the motion picture competitiveness program.
Title
Updating and expanding the motion picture competitiveness program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Business, Financial Services & Trade (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | Returned to Rules. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Business, Financial Services & Trade. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | BFST - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Business, Financial Services & Trade. |
2022-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1914 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-31 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 365 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 365 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 365 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 365 | 040 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 365 | 050 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 04 | 4489 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |