WA HB1850 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-11 - Referred to Local Government.
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-11 - Referred to Local Government.
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting certain department of transportation actions from local review or permit processes under the shoreline management act.
Title
Exempting certain department of transportation actions from local review or permit processes under the shoreline management act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 25 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Local Government. |
2016-01-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2015-04-24 | House | On Concurrence Calendar. Referred to House Rules 3. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 25; nays, 23; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | EET - Majority; do pass. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy and Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy and Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy and Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Telecommunications. |
2015-03-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-03-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-10 | House | Floor amendment |
2015-03-10 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2015-03-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-26 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-02-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-26 | House | TR - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 9:00 AM. |
2015-02-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-20 | House | Referred to Transportation. |
2015-02-19 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-19 | House | LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-30 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government |