WA HB1820 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-13 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Determining average salary for the pension purposes of state and local government employees as certified by their employer.
Title
Determining average salary for the pension purposes of state and local government employees as certified by their employer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-17 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 90 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2014-02-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2014-02-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 90; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2014-02-17 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-17 | House | Floor amendment |
2014-02-17 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2014-02-11 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-10 | House | APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-10 | House | APP - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-10 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-02-11 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |