WA HB1808 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning pupil transportation funding.
Title
Concerning pupil transportation funding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-02 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2022-02-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2022-02-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-01 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-01-20 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-01-20 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2022-01-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2022-01-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
2022-01-06 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28a | 160 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
28a | 160 | 170 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 160 | 180 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 160 | 192 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 160 | 193 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 320 | New Code | See Bill Text |