WA HB1784 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning creation of a certified child safety policy.
Title
Concerning creation of a certified child safety policy.
Sponsors
Rep. Norma Smith [R] | Rep. Ruth Kagi [D] | Rep. Dave Hayes [R] | Rep. Kristine Lytton [D] |
Rep. Nicole Macri [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2017-02-17 | House | ELHS - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-17 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 10:00 AM. |
2017-02-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-30 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1784&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1784.pdf |