WA HB1779 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying rental car company charges, surcharges, and fees to be included in rental car agreements.
Title
Clarifying rental car company charges, surcharges, and fees to be included in rental car agreements.
Sponsors
Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Rep. Dave Quall [D] | Rep. Daniel Roach [R] |
Rep. Alex Wood [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-01-29 | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5509 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-05 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1779&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1779.pdf |