WA SB5509 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-05 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-05 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying rental car company charges, surcharges, and fees to be included in rental car agreements.
Title
Clarifying rental car company charges, surcharges, and fees to be included in rental car agreements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-05 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-05-05 | Chapter 346, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-05-05 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-22 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-21 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-20 | President signed. | |
2009-04-19 | Passed final passage; yeas, 46; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2009-04-19 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2009-04-13 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2009-04-13 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-13 | Floor amendment | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on second reading. | |
2009-03-27 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-23 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-03-23 | TR - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-23 | TR - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-23 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-03-19 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-03-13 | First reading, referred to Transportation. | |
2009-03-10 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5. | |
2009-03-10 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-10 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-03-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-03 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-02-23 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-23 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2009-02-23 | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-19 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-18 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-26 | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1779 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.