WA HB1775 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-03 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning commercially sexually exploited children.
Title
Concerning commercially sexually exploited children.
Sponsors
Rep. Tina Orwall [D] | Sen. Noel Frame [D] | Rep. Sharon Wylie [D] | Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] |
Rep. Nicole Macri [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-03 | House | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-04-03 | House | Chapter 331, 2020 Laws. |
2020-04-03 | House | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-10 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
2020-02-18 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-18 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-18 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-02-18 | House | 3rd substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-10 | House | APP - Majority; 3rd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-10 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-01-31 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-01-28 | House | HSEL - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred to Human Services & Early Learning. |
2020-01-16 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-20 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-20 | House | HSEL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-19 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-15 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-30 | House | First reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5744 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-30 - Referred to Ways & Means.