WA HB1742 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Effective date 6/7/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying the motor vehicle transporter's license to accommodate automotive repair facilities.
Title
Modifying the motor vehicle transporter's license to accommodate automotive repair facilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Melanie Stambaugh [R] | Rep. Jake Fey [D] | Rep. Ed Orcutt [R] | Rep. Marcus Riccelli [D] |
Rep. Joyce McDonald [R] | Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | House | Effective date 6/7/2018. |
2018-03-09 | House | Chapter 16, 2018 Laws. |
2018-03-09 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-03-07 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2017-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-06 | House | Floor amendment |
2017-02-28 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-20 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2017-01-27 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |