WA HB1724 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Ensuring oversight and coordination of permanent supportive housing resources to maximize the creation of high quality housing opportunities for people living with disabling conditions in communities across Washington.
Title
Ensuring oversight and coordination of permanent supportive housing resources to maximize the creation of high quality housing opportunities for people living with disabling conditions in communities across Washington.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-05 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Housing, Human Services & Veterans (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-12 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-05 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Housing, Human Services & Veterans (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-31 | House | Chapter 266, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-31 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-08 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | HLG - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 10:30 AM. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing & Local Government. |
2022-02-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-02-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-12 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-05 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Housing, Human Services & Veterans. |
2022-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2022-02-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-25 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2022-01-20 | House | HHSV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-20 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-11 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Housing, Human Services & Veterans at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Housing, Human Services & Veterans. |
2022-01-03 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 185b | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 330 | New Code | See Bill Text |