WA HB1679 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 31 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-31 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 31 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-31 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing access to catastrophic disability medical insurance under plan 2 of the law enforcement officers' and firefighters' retirement system.
Title
Providing access to catastrophic disability medical insurance under plan 2 of the law enforcement officers' and firefighters' retirement system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-31 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-31 | Chapter 259, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-31 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-11 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-10 | President signed. | |
2010-03-10 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-06 | Passed final passage; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2010-03-06 | House concurred in Senate amendments. | |
2010-03-04 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 2; excused, 1. | |
2010-03-04 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-04 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-03-01 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-03-01 | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-03-01 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-03-01 | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-22 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-02-05 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-03 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-02-03 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-03 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-01 | Placed on second reading. | |
2010-01-26 | WAYS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-26 | WAYS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-01-26 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-25 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-11 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-01-11 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-04-26 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2009-03-07 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2009-03-05 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-03-05 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-05 | Floor amendment | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-27 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-02-27 | WAYS - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-27 | WAYS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-27 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-19 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-01-27 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5541 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.