WA HB1675 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring agencies to disclose the estimated costs of compliance with public records requests.
Title
Requiring agencies to disclose the estimated costs of compliance with public records requests.
Sponsors
Sen. David Frockt [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Rep. Phyllis Kenney [D] | Sen. John McCoy [D] |
Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Rep. Chris Reykdal [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2011-02-16 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-02-16 | SGTA - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-02-16 | SGTA - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-02-16 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-02-07 | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-01-28 | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Affairs. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1675&year=2011 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2011-12/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1675.pdf |