WA HB1665 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing retirement benefits at earlier ages in the plans 2 and 3 of the public employees' retirement system, the teachers' retirement system, and the school employees' retirement system.
Title
Providing retirement benefits at earlier ages in the plans 2 and 3 of the public employees' retirement system, the teachers' retirement system, and the school employees' retirement system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-02-05 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1665&year=2013 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2013-14/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1665.pdf |