WA HB1665 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing procedures for requesting the funds necessary to implement the compensation and fringe benefit provisions of bargaining agreements with the University of Washington under chapter 41.80 RCW.
Title
Establishing procedures for requesting the funds necessary to implement the compensation and fringe benefit provisions of bargaining agreements with the University of Washington under chapter 41.80 RCW.
Sponsors
Sen. Reuven Carlyle [D] | Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] | Rep. Mary Roberts [D] | Rep. Larry Seaquist [D] |
Rep. Michael Sells [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2011-02-15 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-02-15 | LWD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-02-15 | LWD - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-02-15 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workforce Development at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-02-08 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workforce Development at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-01-28 | First reading, referred to Labor & Workforce Development. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5614 (Crossfiled) 2011-05-12 - Effective date 7/22/2011.