WA HB1648 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning ticket sales.
Title
Concerning ticket sales.
Sponsors
Rep. Kristine Reeves [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Liz Berry [D] | Rep. Amy Walen [D] |
Rep. Tarra Simmons [D] | Rep. Alex Ramel [D] | Rep. Tina Orwall [D] | Rep. Davina Duerr [D] |
Rep. Mia Gregerson [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Monica Stonier [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Rep. Melanie Morgan [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-05 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass 3rd substitute bill proposed by Consumer Protection & Business (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business: 3rd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business: 3rd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-20 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-05 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-05 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 3rd substitute bill proposed by Consumer Protection & Business. |
2024-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:30 AM. |
2024-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2024-01-30 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2024-01-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-01-26 | House | CPB - Majority; 3rd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-24 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-16 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-08 | House | Referred to Consumer Protection & Business. |
2024-01-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2024-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-02-24 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-02-24 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-02-24 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2023-02-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2023-02-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2023-02-15 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-02-15 | House | CPB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2023-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Consumer Protection & Business at 1:30 PM. |
2023-01-27 | House | First reading, referred to Consumer Protection & Business. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 345 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
19 | 345 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 345 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |