WA HB1534 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs.
Pending: House Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs.
Pending: House Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying the powers, duties, and functions of the department of veterans affairs.
Title
Clarifying the powers, duties, and functions of the department of veterans affairs.
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Norm Johnson [R] | Rep. Kristine Reeves [D] | Rep. Bradley Klippert [R] |
Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs. |
2018-01-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-07 | House | CDHT - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 10:00 AM. |
2017-02-02 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-23 | House | First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
SB5391 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-04 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1534&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1534.pdf |