WA HB1507 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a mechanism for independent prosecutions of criminal conduct arising from police use of force.
Title
Establishing a mechanism for independent prosecutions of criminal conduct arising from police use of force.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-27 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-02-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-08 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 27 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 27 | 040 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 10 | 232 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 10 | 234 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |