WA HB1478 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a statement of student rights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a statement of student rights.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-02 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - House - House Committee on Education: do pass (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-20HouseHouse Rules "X" file.
2024-01-08HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2023-04-23HouseBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2023-03-23SenateExecutive session, but the motion to report the bill out of the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM failed.
2023-03-20SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
2023-03-06SenateFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
2023-03-02HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 61; nays, 35; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2023-03-02HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2023-03-02HouseFloor amendment
2023-02-27HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2023-02-13HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2023-02-09HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2023-02-09HouseMinority; do not pass.
2023-02-09HouseED - Majority; do pass.
2023-02-09HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM.
2023-01-30HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM.
2023-01-20HouseFirst reading, referred to Education.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
28a230New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1478&Year=2023&Initiative=false
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1478.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1478.E.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Amendments/House/1478%20AMH%20RUDE%20MOET%20178.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Amendments/House/1478%20AMH%20RUDE%20WEIK%20038.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Amendments/House/1478%20AMH%20VOLZ%20WARG%20052.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Amendments/House/1478%20AMH%20WALJ%20RUSM%20054.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Amendments/House/1478%20AMH%20WALJ%20WARG%20051.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1478%20HBA%20ED%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1478%20HBR%20ED%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1478.E%20HBR%20APH%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1478.E%20SBA%20EDU%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1478.E%20SBR%20EDU%20TA%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1478.E%20SBR%20EDU%20OC%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=68253
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=68397
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=128204&actionText=ED%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=30645&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=128204&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-02-2023&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1478&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24

Bill Comments

feedback