WA HB1438 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Regulated Substances & Gaming Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing bona fide charitable or nonprofit organizations to conduct Calcutta auctions on shooting sports contests.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing bona fide charitable or nonprofit organizations to conduct Calcutta auctions on shooting sports contests.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-08HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2023-02-09HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Regulated Substances & Gaming at 8:00 AM.
2023-01-30HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Regulated Substances & Gaming at 1:30 PM.
2023-01-19HouseFirst reading, referred to Regulated Substances & Gaming.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8204050Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
946New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback