WA HB1335 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-2)
Status: Enrolled on April 22 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Delivered to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning review and property owner notification of recorded documents with unlawful racial restrictions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning review and property owner notification of recorded documents with unlawful racial restrictions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-15 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade: do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Committee on Local Government: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22HouseDelivered to Governor.
2021-04-21SenatePresident signed.
2021-04-20HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-04-15HousePassed final passage; yeas, 95; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2021-04-15HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments.
2021-04-07SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-04-07SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-04-07SenateCommittee amendment
2021-04-06SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2021-04-02SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2021-04-02SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2021-04-02SenateWM - Majority; do pass with amendment
2021-04-02SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2021-03-31SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
2021-03-26SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2021-03-25SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2021-03-25SenateBFST - Majority; do pass.
2021-03-25SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM.
2021-03-23SenateExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM.
2021-03-18SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Business, Financial Services & Trade at 8:00 AM.
2021-03-06SenateFirst reading, referred to Business, Financial Services & Trade.
2021-03-04HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2021-03-04HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2021-03-04HouseFloor amendment
2021-03-04House2nd substitute bill substituted
2021-02-25HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2021-02-19HouseAPP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-19HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-18HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2021-02-09HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2021-02-05HouseLG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2021-02-05HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM.
2021-02-03HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM.
2021-02-02HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM.
2021-01-21HouseFirst reading, referred to Local Government

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4960New CodeSee Bill Text
8246010Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8246035Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1335&Year=2021&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1335.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1335-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1335-S2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1335-S2.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House Passed Legislature/1335-S2.PL.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/House/1335-S2%20AMH%20POLL%20H1188.2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Amendments/Senate/1335-S2.E%20AMS%20WM%20S2621.1.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1335%20HBA%20LG%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1335%20HBR%20LG%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1335%20HBR%20APP%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1335-S2.E%20HBR%20APH%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1335-S2.E%20SBA%20BFST%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1335-S2.E%20SBR%20BFST%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1335-S2.E%20SBR%20BFST%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1335-S2.E%20SBA%20WM%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1335-S2.E%20SBR%20WM%20TA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1335-S2.E%20SBR%20WM%20OC%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/Senate/1335-S2.E%20SBR%20APS%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1335-S2.E%20HBR%20SA%2021.pdf
Supplementhttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1335-S2.E%20HBR%20PL%2021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123695&actionText=LG%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28473&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123695&actionText=APP%20-%20Majority%3B%202nd%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=28618&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123695&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-04-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1335&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123695&actionText=BFST%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass.&mId=28816&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=123695&actionText=WM%20-%20Majority%3B%20do%20pass%20with%20amendment%28s%29.&mId=28996&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123695&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=04-07-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1335&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=123695&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=04-15-2021&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=1335&isInit=False&biennium=2021-22

Bill Comments 750

feedback