WA HB1335 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Transferring duties of the life sciences discovery fund.
Title
Transferring duties of the life sciences discovery fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Senate | House Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | FIET - Majority; do pass. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 8:30 AM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade. |
2019-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2019-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-05 | House | ITED - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Innovation, Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Innovation, Technology & Economic Development. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5490 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-19 - Effective date 7/28/2019.