WA HB1324 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Capital Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Capital Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the financing of local infrastructure.
Title
Concerning the financing of local infrastructure.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 3:30 PM. |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Capital Budget. |
2017-02-02 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-02-02 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-02 | House | LG - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2017-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government |
Same As/Similar To
SB5088 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1324&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1324.pdf |