WA HB1285 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Adding the treasurer to the public works board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adding the treasurer to the public works board.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-13SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2019-04-28SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2019-03-29SenateExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-15SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM.
2019-03-09SenateFirst reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections.
2019-03-07HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2019-03-07HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2019-03-05HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2019-02-26HouseCB - Majority; do pass.
2019-02-26HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 9:00 AM.
2019-02-25HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 9:00 AM.
2019-02-19HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM.
2019-01-18HouseFirst reading, referred to Capital Budget.

Same As/Similar To

SB5307 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback