WA SB5307 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adding the treasurer to the public works board.
Title
Adding the treasurer to the public works board.
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] | Sen. John Braun [R] | Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Shelly Short [R] |
Sen. Dean Takko [D] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. Keith Wagoner [R] | Sen. Lynda Wilson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1285 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5307&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5307.pdf |