WA HB1232 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-18 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM.
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-18 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM.
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Planning for affordable housing under the growth management act.
Title
Planning for affordable housing under the growth management act.
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Barkis [R] | Rep. Daniel Griffey [R] | Rep. Carolyn Eslick [R] | Rep. Eric Robertson [R] |
Rep. Jesse Young [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Committee on Local Government: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Committee on Local Government: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | Referred to Local Government. |
2022-01-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2021-04-25 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | HLG - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 10:30 AM. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 10:30 AM. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing & Local Government. |
2021-03-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 77; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-03-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-08 | House | Floor amendment |
2021-03-08 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-23 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-15 | House | LG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 3:30 PM. |
2021-02-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2021-02-10 | House | Public hearing scheduled, but not heard in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2021-02-09 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2021-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 70a | 070 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 70a | 210 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |