WA HB1222 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - Referred to Technology & Economic Development.
Pending: House Technology & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - Referred to Technology & Economic Development.
Pending: House Technology & Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning coal transition power.
Title
Concerning coal transition power.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | House | Referred to Technology & Economic Development. |
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-02-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment at 8:00 AM. |
2013-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Environment. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5297 (Crossfiled) 2013-05-07 - Effective date 7/28/2013.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1222&year=2013 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2013-14/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1222.pdf |