WA HB1219 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning public transportation benefit area governing bodies.
Title
Concerning public transportation benefit area governing bodies.
Sponsors
Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Dan Bronoske [D] | Rep. Alex Ramel [D] | Rep. Liz Berry [D] |
Sen. Marcus Riccelli [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. |
2023-01-13 | House | Referred to Transportation. |
2023-01-13 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2023-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5575 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.