WA HB1207 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Preventing and responding to harassment, intimidation, bullying, and discrimination in schools.
Title
Preventing and responding to harassment, intimidation, bullying, and discrimination in schools.
Sponsors
Rep. Tana Senn [D] | Rep. Skyler Rude [R] | Rep. Jake Fey [D] | Rep. Julia Reed [D] |
Rep. Steve Bergquist [D] | Rep. Alex Ramel [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Lisa Callan [D] |
Rep. My-Linh Thai [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-13 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 64 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House Committee on Education: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House Committee on Education: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | House | Effective date 7/23/2023. |
2023-05-04 | House | Chapter 242, 2023 Laws. |
2023-05-04 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-04-18 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-13 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 64; nays, 32; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2023-04-13 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2023-02-27 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 60; nays, 36; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2023-02-27 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-02-27 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2023-02-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2023-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-01-26 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-01-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-01-26 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-01-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28a | 300 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
28a | 300 | 042 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 600 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 642 | New Code | See Bill Text |