WA HB1195 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Business & Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Business & Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying that a license and endorsement are needed to make small loans.
Title
Clarifying that a license and endorsement are needed to make small loans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-01 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-12 | Referred to Business & Financial Services. | |
2012-01-12 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-22 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2011-03-08 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-03-03 | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Housing & Insurance. | |
2011-03-01 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2011-03-01 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-02-26 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-02-25 | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. | |
2011-02-10 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-04 | BFS - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-02-04 | BFS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-02-04 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-03 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-01-14 | First reading, referred to Business & Financial Services. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5601 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.