WA HB1174 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Improving access and removing barriers to jail-based voting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Improving access and removing barriers to jail-based voting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-08HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2023-02-02HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2023-01-31HouseMinority; do not pass.
2023-01-31HouseSGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2023-01-31HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM.
2023-01-25HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM.
2023-01-18HouseExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM.
2023-01-13HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM.
2023-01-09HouseFirst reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations.
2023-01-06HousePrefiled for introduction.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
29a04New CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1174&Year=2023&Initiative=false
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1174.pdf
Texthttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1174-S.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1174%20HBA%20SGOV%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bill%20Reports/House/1174%20HBR%20SGOV%2023.pdf
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=65653
Supplementhttps://fnspublic.ofm.wa.gov/FNSPublicSearch/GetPDF?packageID=67197
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/majorityminority/recommendation?type=majority&legId=127224&actionText=SGOV%20-%20Majority%3B%201st%20substitute%20bill%20be%20substituted%2C%20do%20pass.&mId=30538&isInit=False&biennium=2023-24

Bill Comments

feedback