WA HB1139 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning providing agencies notice of a dispute under the public records act and an opportunity to cure error in the production of public records.
Title
Concerning providing agencies notice of a dispute under the public records act and an opportunity to cure error in the production of public records.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Armstrong [R] | Rep. Deborah Eddy [D] | Rep. Susan Fagan [R] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] |
Rep. Phyllis Kenney [D] | Rep. Charles Ross [R] | Rep. David Taylor [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-01-27 | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-01-20 | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-01-13 | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5062 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1139&year=2011 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2011-12/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1139.pdf |