WA HB1064 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-7)
Status: Passed on February 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Effective date 2/4/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-7)
Status: Passed on February 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Effective date 2/4/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning law enforcement.
Title
Concerning law enforcement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Effective date 2/4/2019. |
2019-02-04 | House | Chapter 4, 2019 Laws. |
2019-02-04 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-01-30 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-01-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2019-01-24 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-01-24 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-01-24 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-01-24 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Public Safety. |
2019-01-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-17 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-01-15 | House | PS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-01-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
2018-12-17 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5029 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.