WA HB1054 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-8)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the age of individuals at which sale or distribution of tobacco and vapor products may be made.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the age of individuals at which sale or distribution of tobacco and vapor products may be made.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08SenateBy resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
2018-03-08SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.
2018-03-07HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 63; nays, 35; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2018-03-07HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2018-03-07HouseFloor amendment
2018-03-07House2nd substitute bill substituted
2018-02-08HousePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2018-01-26HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2018-01-23HouseMinority; without recommendation.
2018-01-23HouseMinority; do not pass.
2018-01-23HouseFIN - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2018-01-23HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 3:30 PM.
2018-01-08HouseReferred to Finance.
2018-01-08HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration.
2018-01-08HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-06-21HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-05-23HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-24HouseBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-04HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2017-03-30HouseMinority; do not pass.
2017-03-30HouseFIN - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Health Care & Wellness.
2017-03-30HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
2017-02-20HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
2017-02-07HouseReferred to Finance.
2017-02-03HouseMinority; do not pass.
2017-02-03HouseHCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2017-02-03HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM.
2017-01-24HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM.
2017-01-09HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness
2017-01-04HousePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB5025 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-01 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback