WA SB5025 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM.
Pending: Senate Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the age of individuals at which sale or distribution of tobacco and vapor products may be made.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the age of individuals at which sale or distribution of tobacco and vapor products may be made.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-01SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM.
2018-01-08SenateDue to Senate committee reorganization, referred to Labor & Commerce.
2018-01-08SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-06-28SenateExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 12:00 PM.
2017-06-21SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-05-23SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-04-24SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2017-02-09SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 1:30 PM.
2017-01-23SenateReferred to Commerce, Labor & Sports.
2017-01-19SenateMinority; do not pass.
2017-01-19SenateAnd refer to Commerce, Labor & Sports.
2017-01-19SenateHLTH - Majority; without recommendation.
2017-01-19SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM.
2017-01-09SenateFirst reading, referred to Health Care.
2017-01-06SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB1054 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback