WA HB1053 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a sales and use tax exemption for feminine hygiene products.
Title
Providing a sales and use tax exemption for feminine hygiene products.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-26 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2019-01-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |
2018-12-14 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1053&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1053.pdf |