WA HB1031 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Effective date 7/22/2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the county auditor to send voters a security envelope that conceals the ballot.
Title
Requiring the county auditor to send voters a security envelope that conceals the ballot.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-08 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-29 | Effective date 7/22/2011. | |
2011-04-29 | Chapter 182, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-04-29 | Governor signed. | |
2011-04-19 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2011-04-18 | President signed. | |
2011-04-18 | Speaker signed. | |
2011-04-08 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 41; nays, 7; absent, 1; excused, 0. | |
2011-04-08 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-06 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-03-28 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2011-03-15 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-03-14 | GO - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-03-14 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations and Tribal Relations & Elections at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-03-08 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations and Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-24 | First reading, referred to Government Operations, Tribal Relations & Elections. | |
2011-02-23 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2011-02-23 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-02-22 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-02-15 | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. | |
2011-01-20 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-01-17 | SGTA - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-01-17 | SGTA - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-01-17 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-01-12 | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-01-10 | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Affairs. | |
2011-12-14 | Prefiled for introduction. |