WA HB1031 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Early Learning and Children's Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Early Learning and Children's Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning foster parent licensing.
Title
Concerning foster parent licensing.
Sponsors
Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Rep. Ruth Kagi [D] |
Rep. Phyllis Kenney [D] | Rep. Jim Moeller [D] | Rep. Mary Roberts [D] | Rep. Alex Wood [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-01-12 | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Children's Services. | |
2009-12-08 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5015 (Crossfiled) 2009-04-24 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1031&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1031.pdf |