WA HB1029 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the position and authority of warrant officers in first-class cities to enforce court orders and outstanding warrants.
Title
Establishing the position and authority of warrant officers in first-class cities to enforce court orders and outstanding warrants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-01-15 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
2014-12-08 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1029&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1029.pdf |