WA HB1027 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Effective date 1/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Effective date 1/1/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing surplus line broker licensing.
Title
Addressing surplus line broker licensing.
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Barkis [R] | Rep. Brandon Vick [R] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Rep. Steve Kirby [D] |
Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-19 | House | Effective date 1/1/2018. |
2017-04-19 | House | Chapter 49, 2017 Laws. |
2017-04-19 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-04-13 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-04-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | FI - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 8:00 AM. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions & Insurance. |
2017-02-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-02-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-02-02 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-02-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-01-31 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-01-11 | House | BFS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-01-11 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading, referred to Business & Financial Services |
2016-12-08 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5007 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.