WA HB1000 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-23 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-23 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending state route number 397 to Interstate 82.
Title
Extending state route number 397 to Interstate 82.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-09 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2009-02-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-02-13 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-23 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-04-23 | Chapter 184, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-04-23 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-17 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-13 | President signed. | |
2009-04-10 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-09 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2009-04-09 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-04-06 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-04-03 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-04-03 | TRAN - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-04-01 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-16 | First reading, referred to Transportation. | |
2009-02-13 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2009-02-13 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-02-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-01-27 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-01-22 | TR - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-01-22 | TR - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-01-22 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-01-20 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-01-12 | First reading, referred to Transportation. | |
2009-12-02 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5234 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.