VT SR0011 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-24 - As adopted by Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-24 - As adopted by Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Senate resolution relating to amending the permanent rules of the Senate
Title
Senate resolution relating to amending the permanent rules of the Senate
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | Senate | As adopted by Senate |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Adopted by Senate |
2016-03-24 | Senate | New Business/Senate Resolution for Adoption |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Notice Calendar for Wednesday, March 23, 2016 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Read 1st time & placed on Notice Calendar per Rule 34 |