VT S0302 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Read first time and referred to the Committee on Human Services
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Read first time and referred to the Committee on Human Services
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to public health outreach programs regarding dementia risk
Title
An act relating to public health outreach programs regarding dementia risk
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | House | Read first time and referred to the Committee on Human Services |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2024-03-12 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2024-03-01 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare agreed to |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Williams for Committee on Health and Welfare |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2024-03-01 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |