VT S0209 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - Senate Message: Allowed to become law without Governor's signature on May 28, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - Senate Message: Allowed to become law without Governor's signature on May 28, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to prohibiting unserialized firearms and unserialized firearms frames and receivers
Title
An act relating to prohibiting unserialized firearms and unserialized firearms frames and receivers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 110, Nays = 31 (Y: 110 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to on roll call, requested by Senator Baruth, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 26, Nays = 3 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to on roll call, requested by Senator Baruth, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 26, Nays = 3 (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-10 | House | Senate Message: Allowed to become law without Governor's signature on May 28, 2024 |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Allowed to become law without signature of Governor on May 28, 2024 |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on May 22, 2024 |
2024-05-08 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2024-05-08 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment |
2024-05-06 | House | Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2024-05-06 | House | Action Calendar: Senate Proposal of Amendment to House Proposal of Amendment |
2024-05-04 | House | Notice Calendar: Senate Proposal of Amendment to House Proposal of Amendment |
2024-05-04 | House | Senate Message: House proposal of amendment concurred in with further proposal of amendment thereto |
2024-05-02 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in with further proposal of amendment as moved by Senator(s) Baruth, Hashim, Sears, and Vyhovsky |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Baruth, Hashim, Sears, and Vyhovsky; text |
2024-05-02 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Baruth, Hashim, Sears, and Vyhovsky |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Baruth, Hashim, Sears, and Vyhovsky |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2024-04-30 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2024-04-26 | Senate | House proposal of amendment |
2024-04-25 | Senate | House message: House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2024-04-24 | House | Read third time and passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2024-04-24 | House | Rep. LaLonde of South Burlington moved to amend the House proposal of amendment, which was agreed to |
2024-04-24 | House | Rep. Harrison of Chittenden asked and was granted leave to withdraw amendment |
2024-04-24 | House | Rep. Harrison of Chittenden moved to amend the House proposal of amendment |
2024-04-24 | House | Rep. Arsenault of Williston moved to amend the House proposal of amendment, which was agreed to |
2024-04-24 | House | Action Calendar: Third Reading |
2024-04-23 | House | Rep. Arsenault of Williston moved to postpone action until 4/24/2024, which was agreed to |
2024-04-23 | House | Action Calendar: Unfinished Business |
2024-04-22 | House | Action Calendar: Third Reading |
2024-04-19 | House | Rep. Arsenault of Williston moved to postpone action until 4/22/2024, which was agreed to |
2024-04-19 | House | Action Calendar: Third Reading |
2024-04-18 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2024-04-18 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 141 to Pass -- Yeas = 110, Nays = 31 |
2024-04-18 | House | Rep. Sammis of Castleton demanded yeas and nays |
2024-04-18 | House | Second division of amendment agreed to |
2024-04-18 | House | First division of amendment agreed to |
2024-04-18 | House | Rep. Parsons of Newbury asked that the question be divided |
2024-04-18 | House | Rep. Arsenault of Williston reported for the Committee on Judiciary |
2024-04-18 | House | Read second time |
2024-04-18 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2024-04-17 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2024-03-12 | House | Read first time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Title amended as recommended by Committee on Judiciary |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Pending third reading, bill amended as moved by Senator(s) Baruth |
2024-02-29 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2024-02-28 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to on roll call, requested by Senator Baruth, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 26, Nays = 3 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Baruth for Committee on Judiciary |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2024-02-27 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |