VT S0204 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 10 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-11 - House message House appointed Conference Committee members
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 10 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-11 - House message House appointed Conference Committee members
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the registration of short-term rentals
Title
An act relating to the registration of short-term rentals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-16 - Senate - 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Benning, Passed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 28, Nays = 0 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-11 | Senate | House message House appointed Conference Committee members |
2018-05-10 | House | Speaker appointed Head of South Burlington, Baser of Bristol and Read of Fayston as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House |
2018-05-10 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment not concurred in and committee of conference appointed |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Sirotkin, Lyons, and Soucy |
2018-05-10 | Senate | House proposal of amendment not concurred in; Committee of Conference requested, on motion of Senator Sirotkin |
2018-05-10 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-05-10 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2018-05-10 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-05-09 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2018-05-09 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2018-05-08 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-05-08 | House | Report of Committee on Government Operations as amended agreed to |
2018-05-08 | House | Report of the Committee on Government Operations amended as recommended by the Committee on Ways and Means |
2018-05-08 | House | Rep. Baser of Bristol recommended for the committee on Ways and Means |
2018-05-08 | House | Rep. Read of Fayston reported for the committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs |
2018-05-08 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-05-08 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton |
2018-04-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2018-03-22 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2018-03-20 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2018-03-16 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Benning, Passed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 28, Nays = 0 |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs, as amended, agreed to |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs amended as recommended by Committee on Finance |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Sirotkin for Committee on Finance with recommendation of amendment |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Sirotkin for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2018-03-16 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onFinance |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onEconomic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onEconomic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |