VT S0146 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to substance misuse prevention

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to substance misuse prevention

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20SenateHouse message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment
2019-05-17HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment to the House Proposal of Amendment agreed to
2019-05-17HouseSenate Proposal of Amendment considered
2019-05-17HouseRules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2019-05-16HouseSenate message, House proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto
2019-05-16SenateRules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe
2019-05-16SenateHouse proposal of amendment concurred in with proposal of amendment, on motion of Senator Lyons
2019-05-16SenateMotion by Senator Lyons that Senate concur in House Proposal of Amendment with further proposal of amendment
2019-05-16SenateHouse proposal of amendment; text
2019-05-16SenateNew Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2019-05-15SenateHouse Proposal of Amendment
2019-05-15SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2019-05-14HouseRules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2019-05-14SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2019-05-14HouseRead Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
2019-05-14HouseRules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2019-05-14HouseThird Reading Ordered
2019-05-14HouseReport of Committee on Human Services agreed to.
2019-05-14HouseRep. Fagan of Rutland City recommended for the committee on Appropriations
2019-05-14HouseRep. Pajala of Londonderry reported for the committee on Human Services
2019-05-14HouseRead Second Time
2019-05-14HouseRules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney
2019-05-13HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
2019-03-29HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Human Services
2019-03-27SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2019-03-27SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2019-03-26Senate3rd reading ordered
2019-03-26SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations agreed to
2019-03-26SenateReported favorably by Senator McCormack for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment
2019-03-26SenateRead 2nd time
2019-03-26SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2019-03-26SenateNew Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading
2019-03-22SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2019-03-22SenateCommittee Bill for Second Reading
2019-03-22SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2019-03-13SenateReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
2019-03-13SenateCommittee Bill for Second Reading
2019-03-13SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2019-03-12SenateCommittee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback